Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Friedrich von Öttingen

Deceased

Bishop-Elect of Passau, Germany


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1459Born
2 Dec 148526.9SelectedBishop of Passau, Germany
15 Feb 148627.1ConfirmedBishop of Passau, Germany
3 Mar 149031.1DiedBishop-Elect of Passau, Germany

MicroData Summary for Friedrich von Öttingen
Father Friedrich von Öttingen (born 1459, died ) Bishop-Elect of Passau

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 213
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1486, Number 14*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast