Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gonzalo Osorio Villalobos

Deceased

Bishop of Burgos, Spain


Events

DateEventTitle
6 Nov 1301AppointedBishop of León, Spain
26 Dec 1301Ordained BishopBishop of León, Spain
12 Jul 1313AppointedBishop of Burgos, Spain
15 May 1327DiedBishop of Burgos, Spain

MicroData Summary for Gonzalo Osorio Villalobos
Bishop Gonzalo Osorio Villalobos (died ) Bishop of Burgos

  • a bishop for 25.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 299, and Page 151
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1,500, Page 300, Number 125

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast