Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Camilo Ortúzar Montt, S.D.B. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Tarapacá, Chile

Member of Salesians of Saint John Bosco


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Jul 1848Born
25 Sep 187224.1Ordained DeaconDeacon of Santiago de Chile
21 Dec 187224.4Ordained PriestPriest of Santiago de Chile
8 Dec 188234.3AppointedVicar Apostolic of Tarapacá, Chile
1887²38.4ResignedVicar Apostolic of Tarapacá, Chile
8 Dec 188840.3ProfessedMember of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
8 Jan 189546.4DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Tarapacá, Chile

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Camilo Ortúzar Montt
Father Camilo Ortúzar Montt S.D.B. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Tarapacá

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSantiago de Chile, Archdiocese of Santiago de Chile
Death PlaceNice, Diocese of Nice, France

  • a priest for 22.0 years

Source(s):

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 5 Apr 2021

Quantcast