Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Robert Orford, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Ely, England, Great Britain


Events

DateEventTitle
14 Apr 1302SelectedBishop of Ely, England, Great Britain
28 Oct 1302Ordained BishopBishop of Ely, England, Great Britain
21 Jan 1310DiedBishop of Ely, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Robert Orford
Bishop Robert Orford O.S.B. (died ) Bishop of Ely

EventPlace
Ordained BishopRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a bishop for 7.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 238
  • ob/c2: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 69
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 1, Page 333
  • osb: CB, 20 Mar 2016
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 84, Number 6,935

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast