Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Cornelius O’Keeffe

Deceased

Bishop of Limerick, Ireland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1664²Born
15 Feb 172056.1SelectedBishop of Limerick, Ireland
7 Mar 172056.1ConfirmedBishop of Limerick, Ireland
4 May 173773.3DiedBishop of Limerick, Ireland

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Cornelius O’Keeffe
Bishop Cornelius O’Keeffe (born 1664, died ) Bishop of Limerick

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCork Co.
Death PlaceLimerick, Diocese of Limerick
Buried Place (Original)St. John's churchyard

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 244
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1720, Number 35
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 224, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b: The Irish Catholic Episcopal Corps, 1657-1829, Volume 2, Page 99

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast