Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John O’Flynn

Deceased

Bishop of Achonry, Ireland


Events

DateEventTitle
30 Jun 1809AppointedBishop of Achonry, Ireland
12 Nov 1809Ordained BishopBishop of Achonry, Ireland
17 Jul 1817DiedBishop of Achonry, Ireland

MicroData Summary for John O’Flynn
Bishop John O’Flynn (died ) Bishop of Achonry

EventPlace
Ordained BishopChapel, Sligo

  • a bishop for 7.6 years

Source(s):
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1809, Number 15
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 201, Number 16,519
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 57
  • b: The Irish Catholic Episcopal Corps, 1657-1829, Volume 2, Page 96

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast