Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop James O’Fallon

Deceased

Bishop of Elphin, Ireland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1709²Born
3 Aug 175647.5SelectedBishop of Elphin, Ireland
14 Aug 175647.6ConfirmedBishop of Elphin, Ireland
2 Dec 178677.9DiedBishop of Elphin, Ireland

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for James O’Fallon
Bishop James O’Fallon (born 1709, died ) Bishop of Elphin

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTaughboy parish
Death PlaceCloonagh

Source(s):
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1756, Number 38
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 207
  • b: The Irish Catholic Episcopal Corps, 1657-1829, Volume 2, Page 96

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast