Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Charles O’Donnell

Deceased

Bishop of Derry, Ireland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1747²Born
1776²29.0Ordained PriestPriest
9 Feb 179750.1AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Derry, Ireland
9 Feb 179750.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Capsus
24 Nov 179750.8SucceededBishop of Derry, Ireland
1798²51.0Ordained BishopBishop of Derry, Ireland
18 Jul 182376.5DiedBishop of Derry, Ireland

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Charles O’Donnell
Bishop Charles O’Donnell (born 1747, died ) Bishop of Derry

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTemplemore
Buried Place (Original)Long Tower North graveyard

  • a priest for 47.5 years
  • a bishop for 25.5 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 146, and Page 194
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 201, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1798, Number 40
  • b: The Irish Catholic Episcopal Corps, 1657-1829, Volume 2, Page 95

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast