Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Monsignor Keith Newton

Ordinary of Our Lady of Walsingham, England, Great Britain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Apr 1952 Born
1 Jan 201158.7Converted
13 Jan 201158.7Ordained DeaconDeacon of Our Lady of Walsingham, England, Great Britain
15 Jan 201158.7Ordained PriestPriest of Our Lady of Walsingham, England, Great Britain
15 Jan 201158.7AppointedOrdinary of Our Lady of Walsingham, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Keith Newton (VIAF: 307174824)
Monsignor Keith Newton (born ) Ordinary of Our Lady of Walsingham

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLiverpool, Lancashire, Archdiocese of Liverpool, England
Ordained DeaconAllen Hall, Seminary, Chelsea, London, Archdiocese of Westminster, England
Ordained PriestMost Precious Blood, Cathedral, Westminster, London, Archdiocese of Westminster, England

Please contact the Monsignor through the Personal Ordinariate of Our Lady of Walsingham.

  • a priest for years

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 15 Jan 2011
  • loc: CL, 25 Jan 2018
  • od.loc: CL, 13 Jan 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 10 Feb 2021

Quantcast