Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Élie Cardinal di Nabinal, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Cardinal-Priest of San Vitale


Events

DateEventTitle
16 Nov 1332AppointedArchbishop of Nicosia, Cyprus
12 Jul 1342AppointedTitular Patriarch of Jerusalem {Gerusalemme}, Palestine
12 Jul 1342AppointedAdministrator of Nicosia, Cyprus
20 Sep 1342AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Vitale
20 Sep 1342Elevated to Cardinal
13 Jan 1348DiedCardinal-Priest of San Vitale

MicroData Summary for Élie di Nabinal
Élie Cardinal di Nabinal O.F.M. (died ) Cardinal-Priest of San Vitale

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNabinal, France
Death PlaceAvignon

  • a cardinal for 5.3 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 365, and Page 276
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 20 Sep 1342

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 9 Jul 2021

Quantcast