Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Christoph Mendel von Steinfels

Deceased

Bishop of Chiemsee, Germany


Events

DateEventTitle
5 Aug 1502AppointedBishop of Chiemsee, Germany
16 Jul 1503Ordained BishopBishop of Chiemsee, Germany
4 May 1508DiedBishop of Chiemsee, Germany

MicroData Summary for Christoph Mendel von Steinfels (VIAF: 3312250)
Bishop Christoph Mendel von Steinfels (died ) Bishop of Chiemsee

EventPlace
Ordained BishopSalzburg, Archdiocese of Salzburg, Austria

  • a bishop for 4.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 127
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 165
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1503, Number 4
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 59, Number 4,355

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast