Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Muti Papazzurri

Deceased

Bishop of Rieti, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
23 Dec 1297AppointedBishop of Olena, Greece
6 Feb 1300AppointedBishop of Imola, Italy
3 Aug 1302AppointedBishop of Rieti, Italy
1339¹DiedBishop of Rieti, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Muti Papazzurri
Bishop Giovanni Muti Papazzurri (died 1339) Bishop of Rieti

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 416, and Page 284
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 375

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 12 Jun 2021

Quantcast