Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop James Murphy

Deceased

Bishop of Clogher, Ireland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1743²Born
176825.0Ordained PriestPriest
8 May 179855.3AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Clogher, Ireland
8 May 179855.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Eleutheropolis in Macedonia
3 Nov 180158.8SucceededBishop of Clogher, Ireland
19 Nov 182481.8DiedBishop of Clogher, Ireland

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for James Murphy
Bishop James Murphy (born 1743, died ) Bishop of Clogher

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDrumshevra, Co. Monaghan

  • a priest for 56.8 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 170, and Page 206
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1798, Number 41
  • b: The Irish Catholic Episcopal Corps, 1657-1829, Volume 2, Page 86

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast