Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jan Mrz (Frost)

Deceased

Bishop of Olomouc (Olmtz), Czech Republic


Events

DateEventTitle
15 Nov 1392AppointedBishop of Lebus, Germany
20 Jul 1397AppointedBishop of Olomouc (Olmtz), Czech Republic
22 Jul 1403DiedBishop of Olomouc (Olmtz), Czech Republic

Note(s): ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for Jan Mrz (Frost) (VIAF: 84647779)
Bishop Jan Mrz (Frost) (died ) Bishop of Olomouc (Olmtz)

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 313, and Page 376

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast