Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gian Andrea Moscarelli

Deceased

Bishop of Guardialfiera (Guardia), Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Apr 1655Born
22 May 167924.1Ordained DeaconDeacon
23 May 167924.1Ordained PriestPriest
14 May 170348.0AppointedBishop of Guardialfiera (Guardia), Italy
20 May 170348.1Ordained BishopBishop of Guardialfiera (Guardia), Italy
30 Dec 172368.7DiedBishop of Guardialfiera (Guardia), Italy

MicroData Summary for Gian Andrea Moscarelli
Bishop Gian Andrea Moscarelli (born , died ) Bishop of Guardialfiera (Guardia)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBenevento, Archdiocese of Benevento
Ordained BishopSanta Lucia alle Botteghe Oscure, Church, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 44.6 years
  • a bishop for 20.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 215
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1703, Number 39
  • ob/c2/d: AT, 12 Aug 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast