Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Denis Moriarty

Deceased

Bishop of Kerry (o Ardfert) e Aghadoe, Ireland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1652²Born
15 Feb 172068.1SelectedBishop of Kerry (o Ardfert) e Aghadoe, Ireland
7 Mar 172068.1ConfirmedBishop of Kerry (o Ardfert) e Aghadoe, Ireland
17 Oct 1738³86.7DiedBishop of Kerry (o Ardfert) e Aghadoe, Ireland

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Denis Moriarty
Bishop Denis Moriarty (born 1652, died ) Bishop of Kerry (o Ardfert) e Aghadoe

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDingle, Co. Kerry
Ordained PriestReims, Archdiocese of Reims, France

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 96
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1720, Number 34
  • b: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 224, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/op/c1/d: The Irish Catholic Episcopal Corps, 1657-1829, Volume 2, Page 83

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast