Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean de Montrelais

Deceased

Bishop of Nantes, France


Events

DateEventTitle
5 Nov 1378AppointedBishop of Vannes, France
20 Oct 1382AppointedBishop of Nantes, France
13 Sep 1391DiedBishop of Nantes, France

MicroData Summary for Jean de Montrelais
Bishop Jean de Montrelais (died ) Bishop of Nantes

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 520, and Page 356

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 18 Feb 2021

Quantcast