Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Philibert de Montjeu

Deceased

Bishop of Coutances, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1374¹Born
7 Nov 141844.8AppointedBishop of Amiens, France
10 May 142450.3AppointedBishop of Coutances, France
20 Jun 143965.4DiedBishop of Coutances, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Philibert de Montjeu (VIAF: 2179332)
Bishop Philibert de Montjeu (born 1374, died ) Bishop of Coutances

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 205, and Page 85
  • d: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 134

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 8 Mar 2021

Quantcast