Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean de Montigny

Deceased

Bishop of Saint-Pol-de-Léon, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1633Born
20 Sep 166431.7Ordained PriestPriest
24 Aug 167138.6AppointedBishop of Saint-Pol-de-Léon, France
26 Sep 167138.7DiedBishop of Saint-Pol-de-Léon, France

MicroData Summary for Jean de Montigny (VIAF: 17320487)
Bishop Jean de Montigny (born 1633, died ) Bishop of Saint-Pol-de-Léon

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVeneten

  • a priest for 7.0 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 242

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast