Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Pierre Cardinal de Monteruc

Deceased

Cardinal-Priest of Sant’Anastasia


Events

DateEventTitle
20 Nov 1355AppointedBishop of Pamplona, Spain
23 Dec 1356AppointedCardinal-Priest of Sant’Anastasia
23 Dec 1356Elevated to Cardinal
20 May 1385DiedCardinal-Priest of Sant’Anastasia

MicroData Summary for Pierre de Monteruc
Pierre Cardinal de Monteruc (died ) Cardinal-Priest of Sant’Anastasia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDonzenac, Château, Diocese of Tulle, France
Death PlaceAvignon

  • a cardinal for 28.4 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 23 Dec 1356
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 387

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 27 Apr 2021

Quantcast