Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Josť Monteiro, S.J. †

Deceased

Priest of Society of Jesus

Titular See: (never confirmed)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Aug 1649Born
1663²13.3EnteredMember of Society of Jesus
1691²41.3SelectedBishop of Nanking [Nanjing], China
31 Dec 172071.3DiedPriest of Society of Jesus

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Josť Monteiro
Father Josť Monteiro S.J. (born , died ) Priest of Society of Jesus

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLisboa, Patriarchate of Lisboa {Lisbon}, Portugal
Death PlaceMacau

Source(s):
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 19 Jan 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast