Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Jean de Montaigu

Deceased

Archbishop of Sens, France


Events

DateEventTitle
29 Jan 1390AppointedBishop of Chartres, France
11 Apr 1407AppointedArchbishop of Sens, France
25 Oct 1415DiedArchbishop of Sens, France

MicroData Summary for Jean de Montaigu
Archbishop Jean de Montaigu (died ) Archbishop of Sens

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 167
  • b: Series Episcoporum Ecclesiae Catholicae, Page 630

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 6 Mar 2021

Quantcast