Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Hugues Cardinal de Montrelais (Jr.)

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Sabina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1315¹Born
19 Nov 135439.8AppointedBishop of Tréguier, France
21 Aug 135742.6AppointedBishop of Saint-Brieuc, France
20 Dec 137560.9AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santi Quattro Coronati
20 Dec 137560.9Elevated to Cardinal
8 Jul 137964.5AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Sabina
25 Feb 138469.1RemovedCardinal-Bishop of Sabina
29 Feb 138469.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Sabina

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ⁷ After

MicroData Summary for Hugues de Montrelais (Jr.)
Hugues Cardinal de Montrelais (Jr.) (born 1315, died ) Bishop Emeritus of Sabina

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMontrelais, France
Death PlaceAvignon

  • a cardinal for 8.1 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 494, and Page 146
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 20 Dec 1375

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 20 Feb 2021

Quantcast