Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Otto von Mistelbach

Deceased

Bishop of Bamberg, Germany


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1060¹Born
25 Dec 110242.9AppointedBishop of Bamberg, Germany
13 May 110646.3Ordained BishopBishop of Bamberg, Germany
30 Jun 113979.4DiedBishop of Bamberg, Germany

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Otto von Mistelbach (VIAF: 121778073)
Bishop Otto von Mistelbach (born 1060, died ) Bishop of Bamberg

EventPlace
Ordained BishopRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a bishop for 33.1 years
  • Principal Consecrator:
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 226, Number 18,737
  • ob/c2: ATh
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 131, Number 11,711
  • b: Series Episcoporum Ecclesiae Catholicae, Page 259

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast