Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio (Andon) Missirli

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Constantinople (Istanbul) (Armenian), Turkey

Titular Bishop of Sidyma


Events

DateEventTitle
4 Sep 1779AppointedVicar Apostolic of Constantinople (Istanbul) (Armenian), Turkey
4 Sep 1779AppointedTitular Bishop of Alia
22 Nov 1784ResignedVicar Apostolic of Constantinople (Istanbul) (Armenian), Turkey
22 Nov 1784ResignedTitular Bishop of Alia
18 Mar 1808AppointedVicar Apostolic of Constantinople (Istanbul) (Armenian), Turkey
18 Mar 1808AppointedTitular Bishop of Sidyma
16 Oct 1824DiedVicar Apostolic of Constantinople (Istanbul) (Armenian), Turkey

Note(s): ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for Antonio (Andon) Missirli
Bishop Antonio (Andon) Missirli (died ) Vicar Apostolic of Constantinople (Istanbul)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceConstantinople

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 232, and Page 455
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1779, Number 36
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1808, Number 25
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 346

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 19 Mar 2021

Quantcast