Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Walter de Merton

Deceased

Bishop of Rochester, England, Great Britain


Events

DateEventTitle
20 Jul 1274SelectedBishop of Rochester, England, Great Britain
21 Oct 1274Ordained BishopBishop of Rochester, England, Great Britain
27 Oct 1277DiedBishop of Rochester, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Walter de Merton
Bishop Walter de Merton (died ) Bishop of Rochester

EventPlace
Ordained BishopGillingham

  • a bishop for 3.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 64
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 2, Page 561
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 84, Number 6,892

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 6 Feb 2021

Quantcast