Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop William de Melton

Deceased

Archbishop of York, England, Great Britain


Events

DateEventTitle
21 Jan 1316SelectedArchbishop of York, England, Great Britain
25 Sep 1317Ordained BishopArchbishop of York, England, Great Britain
4 Apr 1340DiedArchbishop of York, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for William de Melton
Archbishop William de Melton (died ) Archbishop of York

EventPlace
Ordained BishopAvignon

  • a bishop for 22.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 233
  • ob/c2: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 72
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 3, Page 106
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 84, Number 6,957

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast