Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean de Mello

Deceased

Bishop of Clermont, France


Events

DateEventTitle
2 Oct 1353AppointedBishop of Chalons-sur-Sa˘ne, France
8 Feb 1357AppointedBishop of Clermont, France
23 Dec 1375DiedBishop of Clermont, France

MicroData Summary for Jean de Mello
Bishop Jean de Mello (died ) Bishop of Clermont

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 192, and Page 152

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 6 Mar 2021

Quantcast