Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Guy de Mello

Deceased

Archbishop of Lyon, France

Bishop of Auxerre


Events

DateEventTitle
21 Aug 1245AppointedBishop of Verdun, France
9 Feb 1247AppointedBishop of Auxerre, France
30 Dec 1267AppointedArchbishop of Lyon, France
19 Sep 1270DiedArchbishop of Lyon, France

MicroData Summary for Guy de Mello
Archbishop Guy de Mello (died ) Archbishop of Lyon

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 316, and Page 119
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 530

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 2 Mar 2021

Quantcast