Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paolo Meletijew

Deceased

Titular Bishop of Heracleopolis Magna


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Nov 1880Born
24 Sep 190827.8Ordained PriestPriest
12 Jul 194362.6Ordained BishopBishop
1946²65.1Converted
26 Oct 194665.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Heracleopolis Magna
19 May 196281.5DiedTitular Bishop of Heracleopolis Magna

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Paolo Meletijew
Bishop Paolo Meletijew (born , died ) Titular Bishop of Heracleopolis Magna

EventPlace
Birth PlaceArchangelsk, Russian Federation
Ordained BishopMinsk
Death PlaceBruxelles, Archdiocese of Mechelen-Brussel {Malines-Brussels}, Belgium

  • a priest for 53.6 years
  • a bishop for 18.8 years

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1943, Number 43
  • ob/c23: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 187, Number 15,261
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 188, Number 15,317
  • ob/c23: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 46, Number 3,115
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 54, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast