Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Jules Raymond (Giulio Raimondo) Cardinal Mazarin (Mazzarino)

Deceased

Cardinal-Deacon

Titular See: (never received a deaconry; not a cleric)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Jul 1602Born
16 Dec 164139.4AppointedCardinal-Deacon
16 Dec 164139.4Elevated to Cardinal
29 Nov 165351.3SelectedBishop of Metz, France
1658²55.4ResignedBishop-Elect of Metz, France
9 Mar 166158.6Died

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jules Raymond (Giulio Raimondo) Mazarin (Mazzarino)
Jules Raymond (Giulio Raimondo) Cardinal Mazarin (Mazzarino) (born , died ) Cardinal-Deacon

EventPlace
Birth PlacePescina, Diocese of L’Aquila, Italy
Death PlaceChâteau, Vincennes
Buried Place (Original)Collège des Quatre Nations, Chapel, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris, France

  • a cardinal for 19.2 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 16 Dec 1641
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 240

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 1 Mar 2021

Quantcast