Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Richard Mayew (Mayo)

Deceased

Bishop of Hereford, England, Great Britain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1439Born
28 Jul 150465.5AppointedBishop of Hereford, England, Great Britain
27 Oct 150465.8Ordained BishopBishop of Hereford, England, Great Britain
18 Apr 151677.2DiedBishop of Hereford, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Richard Mayew (Mayo) (VIAF: 161119152)
Bishop Richard Mayew (Mayo) (born 1439, died ) Bishop of Hereford

EventPlace
Birth PlaceHungeford, Berkshire
Ordained BishopLambeth

  • a bishop for 11.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 1, Page 467
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 209
  • ob/c2+: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 96
  • bp: CB, 9 Oct 2017
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1504, Number 12
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 80, Number 6,473

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast