Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Reginald de Maubernard

Deceased

Bishop of Autun, France


Events

DateEventTitle
17 Jun 1353AppointedBishop of Palencia, Spain
20 Jun 1356AppointedBishop of Lisboa, Portugal
25 Aug 1358AppointedBishop of Autun, France
21 Jul 1361DiedBishop of Autun, France

MicroData Summary for Reginald de Maubernard
Bishop Reginald de Maubernard (died ) Bishop of Autun

EventPlace
Death PlaceAvignon, Diocese of Avignon

Source(s):
  • b: CB, 21 Feb 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast