Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Cesare Marullo

Deceased

Archbishop of Palermo, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
14 Jul 1574AppointedBishop of Agrigento (Girgenti), Italy
11 Sep 1577AppointedArchbishop of Palermo, Italy
12 Nov 1588DiedArchbishop of Palermo, Italy

MicroData Summary for Cesare Marullo
Archbishop Cesare Marullo (died ) Archbishop of Palermo

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 269, and Page 99
  • b: Les Ordinations …piscopales, Year 1574, Number 16*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast