Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father George Marin, S.J. †

Deceased

Prefect Emeritus of Süchow, China


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Mar 1895Born
1915²19.8ProfessedMember of Society of Jesus
15 Aug 192631.4Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
3 Dec 193136.7AppointedPrefect of Süchow, China
18 Jun 193540.2ResignedPrefect of Süchow, China

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for George Marin
Father George Marin S.J. (born ) Prefect Emeritus of Süchow

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLowell, MA, Archdiocese of Boston, Massachusetts, USA

Source(s):
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 19 Jan 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast