Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Juan Cardinal Margarit i Pau

Deceased

Bishop of Gerona, Spain

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Balbina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1421¹Born
23 Mar 145332.2AppointedBishop of Elne, France
23 Sep 146140.7AppointedBishop of Gerona, Spain
18 Feb 146241.1InstalledBishop of Gerona, Spain
15 Nov 148362.8Elevated to Cardinal
15 Nov 148362.8AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Vitale
17 Mar 148463.2AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Balbina
21 Nov 148463.8DiedBishop of Gerona, Spain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Juan Margarit i Pau
Juan Cardinal Margarit i Pau (born 1421, died ) Bishop of Gerona

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGerona, Diocese of Gerona
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a cardinal for 1.0 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 15 Nov 1483
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1453, Number 9*
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 150, and Page 159

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast