Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Nicolas Marciari

Deceased

Bishop of Orvieto, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
12 Jul 1359AppointedBishop of Pesaro, Italy
1 Jul 1370AppointedBishop of Fermo, Italy
4 Dec 1374AppointedBishop of Cittą di Castello, Italy
1379²AppointedBishop of Orvieto, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Nicolas Marciari
Bishop Nicolas Marciari , Bishop of Orvieto

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 395, and Page 249
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 191, and Page 508

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.1, 10 Dec 2020; Data: 26 Dec 2020

Quantcast