Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop William of March

Deceased

Bishop of Bath and Wells, England, Great Britain


Events

DateEventTitle
30 Jan 1293AppointedBishop of Bath and Wells, England, Great Britain
17 May 1293Ordained BishopBishop of Bath and Wells, England, Great Britain
11 Jun 1302DiedBishop of Bath and Wells, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for William of March
Bishop William of March (died ) Bishop of Bath and Wells

EventPlace
Ordained BishopCanterbury, Archdiocese of Canterbury, England

  • a bishop for 9.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 130
  • ob/c2+: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 68
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 1, Page 135
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 84, Number 6,923

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast