Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Hugues de Manhac

Deceased

Bishop of Limoges, France


Events

DateEventTitle
12 Jul 1395AppointedBishop of Saint-Flour, France
16 Jan 1404AppointedBishop of Limoges, France
3 Nov 1412DiedBishop of Limoges, France

MicroData Summary for Hugues de Manhac
Bishop Hugues de Manhac (died ) Bishop of Limoges

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 251, and Page 301

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 22 Feb 2021

Quantcast