Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean de Manderscheid-Blankenheim

Deceased

Bishop of Strasbourg, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Feb 1538Born
26 Jan 156930.9SelectedBishop of Strasbourg, France
26 Jun 157335.3ConfirmedBishop of Strasbourg, France
2 May 159254.2DiedBishop of Strasbourg, France

MicroData Summary for Jean de Manderscheid-Blankenheim (VIAF: 42650714)
Bishop Jean de Manderscheid-Blankenheim (born , died ) Bishop of Strasbourg

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBlankenheim, Eiffel
Death PlaceSaverne, Bas Rhin

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 117
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1573, Number 35*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.1, 10 Dec 2020; Data: 18 Jan 2021

Quantcast