Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gilbert de Mandegaches

Deceased

Bishop of Lodève, France


Events

DateEventTitle
14 Aug 1348AppointedBishop of Saint-Pons-de-Thomières, France
30 Jan 1353AppointedBishop of Gap, France
21 Aug 1357AppointedBishop of Lodève, France
21 Jul 1361³DiedBishop of Lodève, France

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Gilbert de Mandegaches
Bishop Gilbert de Mandegaches (died ) Bishop of Lodève

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 406, and Page 514
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 310

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 22 Feb 2021

Quantcast