Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Angelo Mancini de Cacci

Deceased

Bishop of Tivoli, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
12 Aug 1457AppointedBishop of Veroli, Italy
10 Oct 1463AppointedBishop of Sora, Italy
4 Sep 1471AppointedBishop of Tivoli, Italy
1485²DiedBishop of Tivoli, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Angelo Mancini de Cacci
Bishop Angelo Mancini de Cacci (died 1485) Bishop of Tivoli

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 266, and Page 240
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 251
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1457, Number 44*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast