Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Guillaume de Mandagout

Deceased

Bishop of Uzs, France


Events

DateEventTitle
5 Mar 1313AppointedBishop of Lodve, France
14 Feb 1318AppointedBishop of Uzs, France
21 Apr 1344DiedBishop of Uzs, France

MicroData Summary for Guillaume de Mandagout
Bishop Guillaume de Mandagout (died ) Bishop of Uzs

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 511, and Page 309

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 5 Feb 2021

Quantcast