Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Patriarch Angelo Maltraverso, O.P. †

Deceased

Patriarch of Grado, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
5 Oct 1252AppointedArchbishop of Candia {Crete}, Greece
10 Jun 1253Ordained BishopArchbishop of Candia {Crete}, Greece
28 May 1255AppointedPatriarch of Grado, Italy
1271²DiedPatriarch of Grado, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Angelo Maltraverso
Patriarch Angelo Maltraverso O.P. (died 1271) Patriarch of Grado

EventPlace
Ordained BishopRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 17.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 215, and Page 266
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 51, Number 3,464

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast