Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Pietro Maleddu, O.F.M. Conv. †

Deceased

Prefect Emeritus of Ankang [Hinganfu], China


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Feb 1901Born
1921²19.8ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Minor Conventual
22 Jul 192423.4Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Conventual
7 May 194847.2AppointedPrefect of Ankang [Hinganfu], China
1983²81.8RetiredPrefect of Ankang [Hinganfu], China
30 Mar 198887.0DiedPrefect Emeritus of Ankang [Hinganfu], China

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pietro Maleddu
Father Pietro Maleddu O.F.M. Conv. (born , died ) Prefect Emeritus of Ankang [Hinganfu]

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSassari, Archdiocese of Sassari, Italy

  • a priest for 63.6 years

Source(s):
  • b: JPG
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 19 Jan 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast