Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bonaventura MacDonnell, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Killala, Ireland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1697¹Born
14 Mar 172730.2Ordained DeaconDeacon of Order of Friars Minor
7 Jun 172730.4Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
21 Apr 174952.3SelectedBishop of Killala, Ireland
7 May 174952.3ConfirmedBishop of Killala, Ireland
16 Sep 1760³63.7DiedBishop of Killala, Ireland

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Bonaventura MacDonnell
Bishop Bonaventura MacDonnell O.F.M. (born 1697, died ) Bishop of Killala

  • a priest for 33.2 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 77
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1749, Number 38
  • b: The Irish Catholic Episcopal Corps, 1657-1829, Volume 2, Page 69

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast