Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John MacColgan

Deceased

Bishop of Derry, Ireland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1702²Born
1730¹28.0Ordained PriestPriest
21 Mar 175250.2SelectedBishop of Derry, Ireland
4 May 175250.3ConfirmedBishop of Derry, Ireland
21 Dec 1765³63.9DiedBishop of Derry, Ireland

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for John MacColgan
Bishop John MacColgan (born 1702, died ) Bishop of Derry

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCregamullen, Inishowen, Co. Donegal
Buried Place (Original)Clonca

  • a priest for 35.9 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 194
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1752, Number 38
  • b: The Irish Catholic Episcopal Corps, 1657-1829, Volume 2, Page 66

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast