Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Pedro de Luna Albornoz

Deceased

Archbishop of Toledo, Spain

Apostolic Administrator of Tortosa


Events

DateEventTitle
28 Nov 1397AppointedApostolic Administrator of Tortosa, Spain
30 Jul 1403AppointedArchbishop of Toledo, Spain
5 Jul 1405Ordained BishopArchbishop of Toledo, Spain
26 Feb 1410AppointedApostolic Administrator of Tortosa, Spain
19 Sep 1414DiedArchbishop of Toledo, Spain

MicroData Summary for Pedro de Luna Albornoz
Archbishop Pedro de Luna Albornoz (died ) Archbishop of Toledo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMorate de Jalón

  • a bishop for 9.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 487, and Page 223
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 113, Number 9,990
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1,500, Page 306, Number 178
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 141, Number 12,468

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 29 Apr 2021

Quantcast