Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Piotr Lubart

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Płock, Poland

Titular Bishop of Lacedaemonia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1470¹Born
9 Jan 151444.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Płock, Poland
9 Jan 151444.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Lacedaemonia
21 Dec 153060.9DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Płock, Poland

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Piotr Lubart
Bishop Piotr Lubart (born 1470, died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Płock

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKraków, Diocese of Kraków
Death PlaceKraków, Diocese of Kraków
Buried Place (Original)St. Mary, Church, Kraków, Diocese of Kraków

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 217
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1514, Number 1*
  • bd/d/loc: CB, 4 Aug 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast