Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bertrand de La Tour d’Auvergne

Deceased

Bishop of Le Puy-en-Velay, France


Events

DateEventTitle
14 Aug 1353AppointedBishop of Toul, France
5 Nov 1361AppointedBishop of Le Puy-en-Velay, France
14 May 1382DiedBishop of Le Puy-en-Velay, France

MicroData Summary for Bertrand de La Tour d’Auvergne
Bishop Bertrand de La Tour d’Auvergne (died ) Bishop of Le Puy-en-Velay

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 502, and Page 91

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 2 Mar 2021

Quantcast